Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 04/11/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 04/11/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/22/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/22/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/22/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/22/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/22/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/22/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/15/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/15/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/15/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/15/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/15/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 07/15/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/15/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/15/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/15/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/10/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 10/02/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/02/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 10/02/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/30/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/30/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/30/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/30/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/30/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 01/21/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/21/2004
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/02/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 03/02/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/02/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/02/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/02/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 04/01/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/01/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/01/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/01/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/01/2004
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 04/01/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/01/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/01/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/11/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/11/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/18/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/09/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/09/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/09/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/09/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/09/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/18/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/18/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/18/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/22/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/22/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/22/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/09/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/07/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/07/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/07/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 11/17/2004