Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/11/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/11/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 04/11/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/11/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/12/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/15/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/30/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/21/2003
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/20/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/01/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/15/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/19/2004