Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 04/11/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 04/11/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 04/11/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/29/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/29/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/06/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/06/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 05/06/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/06/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/06/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/06/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/06/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/06/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/07/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/19/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/19/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/10/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/10/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/10/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/10/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/10/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/16/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/21/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/15/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/15/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/15/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 10/17/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 10/17/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 10/17/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/30/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/30/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/30/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 11/17/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/30/2004
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/09/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/09/2004