Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/05/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/05/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/05/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/05/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/05/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 02/05/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/05/2003
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 02/05/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/05/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/05/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/05/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/05/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 02/05/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/05/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/05/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/05/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/05/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/05/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/05/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 02/05/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/05/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/05/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/05/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/05/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/05/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/05/2003
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 02/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/05/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/05/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/05/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/05/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/05/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/05/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/05/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/11/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/11/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 02/11/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/11/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/11/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 02/11/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/11/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/11/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 02/11/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/11/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/11/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/11/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/11/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/11/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/11/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/13/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/13/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/13/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/13/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/13/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/13/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/13/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/27/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/27/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/27/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/27/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/27/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 02/27/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/27/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/06/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/06/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/06/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/06/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/06/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/06/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/06/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 03/06/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/06/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/06/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/06/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/06/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/06/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/06/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/06/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/06/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/17/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/17/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/17/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 03/17/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/17/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/17/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/17/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/17/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/17/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/17/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/20/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/20/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/20/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/20/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/20/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/27/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/27/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/27/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/27/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/27/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/07/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/07/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/10/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/10/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/10/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/10/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/10/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/07/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/07/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/19/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/05/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 06/05/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/05/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/05/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/05/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/08/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/24/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 07/25/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/25/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/25/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/20/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/04/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/04/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/04/2004
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 02/04/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/04/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/04/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/04/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/04/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/04/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/04/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/04/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/04/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/04/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/11/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/11/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/11/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/11/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/24/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/24/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 02/24/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 03/04/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/04/2004
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 03/04/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/11/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/11/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/11/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/18/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/25/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 04/01/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/24/2004