Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/12/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/12/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/12/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/12/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/12/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/12/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/12/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/12/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/12/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/12/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/12/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 04/29/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 04/29/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/29/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 04/29/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/29/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/29/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/01/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/01/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/06/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/06/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/06/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/09/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/09/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/09/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 05/20/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/20/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/20/2003