Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/11/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/11/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/11/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/11/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/11/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/11/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/11/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/29/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 04/29/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/29/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/29/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/29/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/29/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/29/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/29/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/29/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/29/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/29/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 04/29/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/29/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/29/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/29/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/30/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/30/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/30/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/30/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/30/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/30/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/30/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/30/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/30/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/06/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/06/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/06/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 05/06/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/06/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/06/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/06/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/06/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/06/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/06/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/06/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/06/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/06/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/06/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/07/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/07/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/07/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/07/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/07/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/07/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/08/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/08/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/08/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/08/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/08/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/08/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/08/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/09/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/09/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/09/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/13/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 05/13/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/13/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/13/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/13/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/13/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/14/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/14/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/14/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/15/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/15/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/15/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/19/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/19/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/19/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/19/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/21/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/02/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/10/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/10/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/10/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 06/18/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/24/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/10/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/10/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/10/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/10/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/10/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/10/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 07/10/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/10/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/14/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/14/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/14/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/14/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/14/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/15/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/15/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/16/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/16/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/16/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/16/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/18/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/21/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/21/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/09/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/09/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/09/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/09/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/09/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/17/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/17/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/17/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/23/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/30/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/02/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/08/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/16/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/16/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/16/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 11/04/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/04/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/04/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/04/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/04/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 11/05/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/05/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 11/07/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/19/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/21/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 12/08/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 01/20/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/30/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/05/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/08/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/07/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 09/07/2004