Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 04/09/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/11/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/11/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/08/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/08/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/08/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/26/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/26/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/26/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/26/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/26/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/26/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/26/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/26/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/26/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/26/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/26/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/26/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/26/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 06/26/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/26/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/26/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/26/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/26/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/26/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/26/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/26/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/26/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/26/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/17/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/17/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/17/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/21/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/21/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/25/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/04/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/04/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/04/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/04/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/04/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/04/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/10/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/10/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/10/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/10/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/24/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/24/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/24/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/24/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/24/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/01/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/01/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/01/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/01/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/01/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/01/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/01/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 10/01/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/01/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/02/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/02/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/15/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/15/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/15/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/15/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/15/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/15/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/15/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/15/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/28/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/28/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/28/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/30/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/30/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/30/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/30/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/07/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 11/07/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/20/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/20/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/20/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/03/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/03/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/03/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/03/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 02/03/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/26/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/26/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/10/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/10/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/10/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/02/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/02/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/27/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/27/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/27/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/27/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/12/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/12/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/12/2004
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/20/2004
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/01/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/01/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/17/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/17/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/21/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 06/24/2004
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/24/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/22/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/07/2004
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/23/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/06/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/16/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/18/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/18/2004