Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/07/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/29/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/22/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/05/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/05/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/18/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/18/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/18/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/18/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/16/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/16/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 09/23/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/28/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/05/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/27/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/03/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/26/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/18/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/29/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/27/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/28/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/11/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/22/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/07/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/14/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/14/2004