Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/29/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/29/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/29/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/29/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/29/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/29/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/01/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/01/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/01/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/01/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/01/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/06/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/06/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/06/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/06/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/08/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/08/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/08/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/08/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/08/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/08/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/08/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 05/08/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/08/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/08/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/08/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/08/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/08/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 05/15/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/15/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/15/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/16/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/16/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/16/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/16/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/09/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/07/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/25/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/25/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/25/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/25/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/03/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/03/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/03/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/10/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/10/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/10/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/17/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/17/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/29/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/29/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/29/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/29/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/29/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/29/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/29/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/29/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/29/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/29/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/30/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/30/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/30/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/20/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/20/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/20/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/20/2004
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/20/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/20/2004
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/20/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/20/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/11/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/11/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/11/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/11/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/11/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 05/11/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/11/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/11/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/25/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/25/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/25/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/25/2004