Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/01/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/01/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/01/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/01/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/01/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/06/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 05/06/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/07/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/07/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/07/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/07/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/07/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/07/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/07/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/07/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 05/14/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/14/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 05/14/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/14/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/19/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/19/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/19/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/19/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/19/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/19/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/21/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/21/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/21/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/21/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/21/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/21/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/21/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/21/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/21/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/02/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/02/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/02/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/02/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/04/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/04/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/04/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/10/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/10/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/10/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/10/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/10/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/10/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/10/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/17/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/17/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/17/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/17/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 06/17/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/17/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/26/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/26/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/26/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/26/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/14/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/14/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/14/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/14/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/14/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/14/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/18/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/18/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/03/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/03/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/03/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/04/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/04/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/04/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/04/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/04/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/04/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/10/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/24/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/24/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/24/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/24/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/24/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/25/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/25/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/25/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/25/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/01/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/01/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/01/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/01/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/01/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/01/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/01/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/01/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/08/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/08/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/21/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/21/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/21/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/21/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/21/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/21/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/29/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/29/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/04/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/04/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/04/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 11/04/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/05/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/05/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/05/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/06/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 11/06/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/06/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/06/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/10/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 11/10/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/10/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 11/19/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 11/19/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/19/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/19/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 11/19/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/19/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/20/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/20/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/20/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/20/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/20/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/20/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/20/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 11/21/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/21/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/21/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/21/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 11/21/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/21/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/21/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/21/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/21/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/21/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 11/21/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 11/25/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 11/25/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/25/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/25/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/25/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 11/25/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 11/25/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/25/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/25/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/08/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 12/08/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 12/08/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 01/21/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/21/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 01/23/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/10/2004
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/10/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/11/2004
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/11/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/11/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/24/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/25/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/25/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/25/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/26/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/26/2004
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/26/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/26/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/03/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/03/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 06/08/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/21/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/08/2004