Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/27/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/27/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/31/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/31/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/03/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/07/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/10/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/29/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 04/29/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/29/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/06/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/05/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/09/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/09/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/16/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/17/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/03/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 02/03/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/24/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/02/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/11/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/14/2004