Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/19/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/19/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/19/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/20/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/20/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/25/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/25/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/25/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/25/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/25/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/25/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/31/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/31/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/31/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/31/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/31/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/31/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/01/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/01/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/08/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/08/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/08/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/08/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/11/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/30/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/30/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/09/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/19/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/22/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/22/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/22/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/22/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/04/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/04/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/04/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/04/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/16/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/16/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/09/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/09/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/04/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/04/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 10/02/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/28/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/03/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/09/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/22/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/21/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/21/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/21/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/29/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/04/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/07/2004