Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/13/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/19/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/19/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/19/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/19/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/20/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/20/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/20/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/20/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/20/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/20/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/20/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/20/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/25/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/25/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/26/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/26/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/26/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/31/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/03/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/03/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/03/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/03/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/09/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/06/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/14/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/21/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/21/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/22/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/02/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/02/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/02/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/02/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/02/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/12/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/23/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/25/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/05/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/08/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 01/21/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/02/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/02/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/18/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/23/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/23/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/02/2004