Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/11/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/12/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/26/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/09/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 04/11/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/11/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/11/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/11/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 04/11/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/11/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 04/11/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/11/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/11/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/11/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/11/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/11/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/11/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/12/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 04/12/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/30/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/30/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/30/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 04/30/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/30/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/30/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 04/30/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/01/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/01/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/01/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/01/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/01/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/01/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/01/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 07/10/2003