Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/06/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/06/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/06/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/06/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/06/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 03/06/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/13/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/13/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/13/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/13/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/13/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 03/13/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/03/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/03/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/03/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/03/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/01/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/01/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/01/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 05/01/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/01/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/01/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/01/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/01/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/01/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/09/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/09/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 05/09/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/09/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/09/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/09/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/09/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/15/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/15/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/15/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/05/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/05/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/05/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/05/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/05/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/05/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/05/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/12/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/19/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/19/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/19/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/19/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/10/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/10/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/25/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 07/25/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/25/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/25/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/05/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/05/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/09/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/09/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/15/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/15/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/01/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/01/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/06/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/20/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 01/20/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 01/27/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/01/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/03/2004
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/12/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/17/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/24/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/29/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/31/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/01/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 04/20/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/20/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/21/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/21/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/21/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/27/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/27/2004
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/04/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/10/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/10/2004
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/10/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/12/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/20/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/20/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/01/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/01/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/01/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/03/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/14/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 06/23/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/20/2004
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 09/13/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/13/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/15/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/17/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/17/2004
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/05/2004