Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 03/06/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/27/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 03/27/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/02/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/07/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 04/07/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/07/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 04/29/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/08/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/09/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/09/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/15/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 05/15/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/15/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/21/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 05/22/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/22/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/22/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 05/22/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/22/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/22/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/22/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/22/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/22/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/22/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/22/2003

Show cosponsors who withdrew