Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/05/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/05/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 03/05/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/05/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/05/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 03/05/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/05/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/05/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/13/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/13/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 03/13/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/13/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/13/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/13/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/03/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/03/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/03/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/03/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/01/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/01/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/01/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/01/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/01/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/06/2003