Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 03/04/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/06/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/06/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/06/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/06/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/06/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/06/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/06/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/06/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/06/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/06/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/06/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/06/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/06/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/06/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/06/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/06/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/06/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/06/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/06/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/06/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/06/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/06/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/06/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/06/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/06/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/06/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/06/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/06/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/06/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/10/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/10/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/10/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/10/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/10/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/10/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/10/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/10/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/10/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/10/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/10/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/11/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/11/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/11/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/11/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/11/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/11/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 03/11/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/11/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/11/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/11/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/17/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/17/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/17/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/17/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/17/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/17/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/17/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/19/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/19/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/19/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/19/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/19/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 03/19/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/19/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/19/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/19/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/20/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/20/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 03/20/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 03/20/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/20/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/26/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/26/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/26/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/26/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/26/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 03/26/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/01/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/01/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/01/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/01/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/01/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/01/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/08/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/08/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/08/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/08/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/08/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/11/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 04/11/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/11/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/11/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/11/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/11/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/29/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/06/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/06/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/19/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/19/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/19/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/19/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/22/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/22/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/03/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/03/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/03/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/11/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/11/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/11/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/11/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/11/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/17/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/17/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/17/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/17/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/23/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/23/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/23/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/23/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/24/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/24/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/24/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/24/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/24/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/26/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/26/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/26/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/26/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/26/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 06/26/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/07/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/07/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 07/07/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/09/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/09/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/09/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/09/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/09/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/15/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/15/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/17/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/17/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/02/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 10/02/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/07/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 11/21/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/02/2004