Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/04/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/20/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/01/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/26/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/09/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/05/2004