Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/05/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/05/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/05/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/05/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/10/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/09/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/09/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/22/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/22/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/22/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/02/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/02/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/04/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/04/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/23/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 11/05/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/05/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 02/26/2004