Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 04/22/2002
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 04/22/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 04/22/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/22/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/23/2002
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 04/23/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 04/23/2002
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/23/2002
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 04/23/2002
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 04/23/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/23/2002
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/23/2002
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/23/2002
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/23/2002
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 04/24/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/24/2002
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/24/2002
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/24/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 04/26/2002
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/26/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/26/2002
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/26/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 04/29/2002
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/30/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/30/2002
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/30/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/30/2002
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/30/2002
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/30/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/01/2002
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 05/01/2002
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/01/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/01/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/01/2002
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/01/2002
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 05/01/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 05/01/2002
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 05/01/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/01/2002
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/01/2002
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/01/2002
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/01/2002
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 05/01/2002
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 05/01/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/01/2002
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/01/2002
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/01/2002
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/01/2002
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/01/2002
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/01/2002
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 05/01/2002
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/01/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 05/02/2002
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/02/2002
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/02/2002
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/02/2002
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/02/2002
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 05/02/2002
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/02/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/02/2002
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 05/02/2002
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/02/2002
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 05/02/2002
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/02/2002
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/06/2002
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/07/2002
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/07/2002