Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 10/02/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 10/02/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/03/2001
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 10/03/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/09/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/10/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/11/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 10/15/2001