Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/26/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/19/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 10/04/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/15/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 04/12/2002
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/09/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/19/2002
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/19/2002
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/20/2002