Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 02/28/2001
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 02/28/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/28/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 02/28/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 03/06/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/06/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/08/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/13/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/29/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/03/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 10/30/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/30/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 02/28/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/11/2002
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 05/15/2002
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/28/2002
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/03/2002