Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/08/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/08/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/08/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/08/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 02/08/2001
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 02/08/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/08/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 02/08/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 02/08/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/08/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/08/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 02/08/2001
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 02/08/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 02/08/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/08/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/08/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/08/2001
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 02/08/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/08/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 02/08/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 02/08/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/13/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/13/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 02/13/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/13/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/13/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 02/15/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 02/15/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/26/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 02/28/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/28/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 03/01/2001
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/06/2001
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/26/2001