Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/06/2002
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/08/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/18/2002
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/09/2002
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/06/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew