Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 11/30/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 11/30/2001
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 11/30/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 11/30/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 11/30/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 11/30/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 11/30/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 11/30/2001
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 11/30/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 11/30/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 11/30/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 11/30/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 11/30/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 11/30/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 11/30/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 12/04/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/04/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 12/04/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 12/04/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 12/11/2001
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 12/11/2001
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 12/12/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 12/12/2001
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 12/13/2001
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 12/13/2001
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 12/13/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 12/13/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 12/13/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 12/13/2001
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 12/17/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 12/17/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 12/17/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 12/17/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 12/17/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 12/19/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 12/19/2001
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 12/19/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 12/20/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 12/20/2001
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 01/23/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 01/24/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 02/05/2002
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 02/05/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 02/06/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 02/07/2002
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/12/2002
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 02/14/2002
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/26/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/12/2002
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/12/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/19/2002
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/19/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 03/19/2002
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/19/2002
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/19/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 04/08/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/09/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 04/09/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/10/2002
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/15/2002
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/16/2002
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 04/16/2002
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/16/2002
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/18/2002
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/18/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 04/25/2002