Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/13/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/13/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/13/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 02/15/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 02/15/2001
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/15/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/15/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/15/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 02/27/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 02/27/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/23/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/29/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/02/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/04/2001
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 04/05/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/06/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/01/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/07/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/14/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 05/23/2001
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/05/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/22/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/26/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/12/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 07/12/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/27/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 07/27/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/31/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 09/04/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/04/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/10/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/10/2001
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 10/17/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 01/24/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/12/2002
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 05/10/2002
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/17/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 11/19/2002