Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 11/13/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/27/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/08/2002
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/16/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/22/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/23/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 06/28/2002
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/09/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 07/25/2002