Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 08/01/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 08/01/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 08/01/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 08/01/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/10/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/10/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/19/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 07/11/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 07/31/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/04/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 09/04/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/18/2002