Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/06/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/06/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/06/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/06/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/06/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/06/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/06/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/06/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/06/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/06/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/06/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/06/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/06/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 02/06/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/06/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/08/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/08/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/12/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/12/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/12/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 02/12/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 02/12/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/12/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/13/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/13/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/26/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/26/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/26/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/26/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/27/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/27/2002