Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 05/26/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 05/26/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 05/26/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/26/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/26/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/26/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 05/26/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 05/26/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/26/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/26/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/26/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/26/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/26/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/20/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/20/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/20/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/20/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/20/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/20/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/20/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/20/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/20/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/20/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/20/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/20/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/20/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/20/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/20/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/20/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/20/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/28/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/28/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/28/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/28/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/28/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/28/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/28/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/28/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/28/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/28/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/10/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/10/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/10/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/10/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/10/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/10/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/10/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/10/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/23/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/23/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/23/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/23/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/23/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/23/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/23/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/23/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 07/23/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 07/23/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/23/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/23/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/26/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/26/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/26/2002