Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/04/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 04/04/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/24/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 04/24/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/24/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/08/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/08/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/08/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/17/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/17/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/12/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/12/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/21/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/12/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 08/02/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/09/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/18/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/18/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/18/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/26/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/04/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/16/2002