Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 12/20/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 12/20/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 01/24/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 01/24/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 01/24/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/24/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/27/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/19/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/23/2002
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/26/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/09/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/09/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/09/2002