Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 12/04/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 12/04/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 12/06/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 12/06/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 12/06/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 12/06/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 12/06/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 12/06/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 12/11/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 12/11/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 12/11/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 12/11/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 12/11/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 12/11/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/11/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 12/11/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 12/11/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 12/11/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 12/11/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 12/11/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 12/11/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 12/11/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 12/11/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 12/11/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 12/11/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 12/11/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/11/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 12/11/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 12/11/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 12/11/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/11/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 12/12/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 12/12/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/12/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 12/13/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/13/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 12/18/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 12/18/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 12/18/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/18/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 12/18/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 12/18/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 12/18/2001