Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/22/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/22/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 03/22/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 04/04/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 04/04/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/13/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 03/13/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/13/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/10/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/10/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/10/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 04/10/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/10/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/10/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 04/10/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/18/2002