Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/11/2002
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 07/11/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/15/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/15/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/15/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/15/2002
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/15/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/15/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/15/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/15/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/16/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/16/2002
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/16/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/16/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/16/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/16/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/16/2002
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 07/16/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/16/2002
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/16/2002
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/16/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/17/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/17/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/17/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/17/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/17/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/18/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/18/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/18/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/18/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/18/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/18/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/18/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/18/2002
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/18/2002
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/18/2002
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/18/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/18/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/18/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/22/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/22/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/22/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/22/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/22/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/22/2002
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/22/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/22/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/22/2002
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/22/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/22/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/22/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/22/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/22/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/22/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/22/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/22/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/22/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/22/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/22/2002