Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 02/27/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/27/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/28/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/28/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/28/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/28/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/06/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/06/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/06/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/06/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/08/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/08/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/13/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/13/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/13/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 03/20/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/03/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/03/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/24/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/24/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/01/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/01/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/10/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/10/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/10/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/17/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/17/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/21/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/21/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/23/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/23/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/24/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/25/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/05/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/13/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/13/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/26/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/26/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/17/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 08/02/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/02/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 11/08/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/04/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 02/04/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/06/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/06/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/06/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/11/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/11/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/11/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/12/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/12/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/12/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/12/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/19/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/19/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/19/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/19/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/09/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 04/25/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/25/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/09/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/05/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/18/2002