Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/14/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 03/14/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 03/14/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/14/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 03/14/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 03/14/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/14/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/14/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/02/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/14/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/17/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/09/2002