Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/07/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/07/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/07/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/07/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/07/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 03/07/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 03/12/2002
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/12/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/14/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/19/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/10/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/10/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/10/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/11/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/16/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/16/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/18/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/18/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/18/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/18/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/23/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/24/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 04/24/2002
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/24/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/01/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 05/01/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/02/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/07/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/07/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/08/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/20/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/21/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/10/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/10/2002