Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/25/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/25/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/25/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/25/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/25/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/25/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/25/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/25/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/25/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/25/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/25/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/25/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/02/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/02/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/02/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/02/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/02/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/02/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/02/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/02/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/02/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 10/02/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/02/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/02/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/02/2001
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 10/02/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/02/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 10/02/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/02/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/02/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/03/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/03/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/03/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 10/03/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/03/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/03/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/03/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 10/03/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/03/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/03/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/03/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/03/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/03/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/11/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/11/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/11/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/11/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/11/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/11/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/11/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/11/2001
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 10/11/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/12/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 10/12/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/12/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 10/12/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/12/2001
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 10/12/2001
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/12/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/12/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/12/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/12/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/12/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 10/12/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 10/12/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/12/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/12/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/12/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/12/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 10/12/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/12/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/12/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/12/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/12/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/12/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/16/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 10/16/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/16/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/16/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 10/16/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/16/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/16/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/16/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/16/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/16/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/31/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/31/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/31/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 11/07/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 11/07/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 11/15/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/15/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/15/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/15/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/15/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 11/15/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/15/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/15/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/15/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 11/15/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/15/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/15/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/15/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/16/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/16/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/16/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/16/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 11/16/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 11/16/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/29/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/29/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 11/29/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/29/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/29/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/04/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 12/04/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/04/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 12/04/2001