Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 07/18/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 07/18/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 07/18/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/19/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/19/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/19/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/19/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/25/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/25/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/25/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/25/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/25/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/25/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/25/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/25/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/25/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/25/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/25/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/27/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/27/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 07/27/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/27/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/27/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/27/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/27/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/30/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/30/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/30/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/30/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/30/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 08/01/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 08/01/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 08/01/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 08/02/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/10/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/10/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/10/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/10/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/10/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/10/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/10/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/10/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/10/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/10/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/10/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/10/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/10/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/10/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/10/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 09/10/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/10/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/10/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/10/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/12/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 09/13/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/13/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/14/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/19/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/20/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/02/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/10/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/10/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/12/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/19/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/18/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/18/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/12/2002
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/18/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/11/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/23/2002