Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/20/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/20/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 06/20/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/20/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/20/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 06/20/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/28/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 06/28/2001
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/28/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/28/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/23/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/23/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/23/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/23/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/23/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/23/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 03/20/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/20/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/20/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/20/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/20/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/10/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/10/2002