Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/04/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/26/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/26/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/26/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/15/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/23/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/22/2002