Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 01/03/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/27/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/27/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/27/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/27/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 02/27/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/27/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/27/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/27/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/27/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/27/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/27/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/27/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/08/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/08/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/08/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/08/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/08/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/08/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/27/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/27/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/27/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/27/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/04/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/04/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/26/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/26/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 04/26/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/05/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/05/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/05/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/05/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/21/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/21/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/21/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 07/26/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/01/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 08/01/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/11/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/11/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/24/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 01/24/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 02/13/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/02/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/22/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/22/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/22/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/05/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/05/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/05/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/26/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/03/2002