Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 03/06/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/06/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/06/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/07/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/07/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/08/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/08/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/20/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/27/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/27/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/27/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/27/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/27/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 03/28/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/28/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/28/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/29/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/03/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/03/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/04/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/04/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/24/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/24/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/01/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/01/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/01/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/01/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 05/01/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/01/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/01/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/01/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/01/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/01/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/01/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/01/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/08/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/08/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/08/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/08/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/08/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/08/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/08/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/08/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/08/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/08/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/08/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/08/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/08/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/08/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/15/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 05/15/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/15/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/15/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/15/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/15/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/15/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/15/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/15/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/15/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/16/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/16/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/16/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/16/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/17/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/17/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/23/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/23/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/23/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/23/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/23/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/23/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/23/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/23/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/23/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/23/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/23/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/05/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/05/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 06/05/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/05/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/05/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/05/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/12/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/12/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/12/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/12/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 06/12/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/12/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/12/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/12/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/12/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/12/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/12/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/12/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/21/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/21/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/21/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/21/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/21/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/27/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/27/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/27/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/27/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/28/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/28/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/19/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/06/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/10/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 09/12/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/12/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 10/03/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/16/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/16/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/20/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/12/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/12/2002