Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/01/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/01/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/01/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/01/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/01/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/01/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 05/01/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/01/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/01/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/01/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/01/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/09/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/09/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/09/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/09/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/09/2001
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/09/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/09/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/09/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/09/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/09/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/09/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 05/15/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/15/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/05/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/05/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/05/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/05/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/05/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/05/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/05/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/05/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/14/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/14/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/14/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/27/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/27/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/27/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 06/27/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/27/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/10/2001
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 07/10/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 07/10/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/18/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/18/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/24/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/26/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/30/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/30/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/30/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 08/01/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 08/01/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/01/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/05/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/05/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/05/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/05/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/21/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/21/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/21/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/21/2001
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 10/09/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/09/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/09/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/09/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/09/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/15/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/19/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 02/05/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/05/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/05/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/05/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/05/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/05/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/05/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/12/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/12/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/12/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/12/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/19/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/19/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/19/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/15/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/15/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/15/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/15/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/15/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 04/15/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/15/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 04/15/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/15/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/15/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/15/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/15/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/15/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/15/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/15/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/16/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/16/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 04/16/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/16/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/18/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/18/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 04/18/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/18/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/25/2002
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/25/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/25/2002
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/25/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/25/2002
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/25/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/02/2002
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/02/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/02/2002
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/02/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/02/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/09/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/09/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/09/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/09/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/09/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/14/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/21/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/21/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 05/21/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/06/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/06/2002
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/13/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/13/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 06/13/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/13/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/18/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/18/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/24/2002
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/24/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/27/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/27/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/10/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/10/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 07/22/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/22/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/26/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/26/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/26/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/09/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/09/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/09/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/12/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/12/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/17/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/17/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/17/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/19/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/19/2002
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/19/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/19/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/19/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/24/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/24/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/24/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/24/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/02/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/08/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/08/2002