Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 03/01/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/01/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 03/01/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/19/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/19/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/19/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 03/19/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/19/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/04/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/07/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/07/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/07/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/07/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 06/07/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/07/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/28/2001