Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/01/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/13/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/03/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/09/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/09/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/24/2001