Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/28/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 02/28/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/28/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/28/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 02/28/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/28/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/06/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/06/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/06/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/06/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/06/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/20/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/24/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/24/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/17/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/17/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/17/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/17/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/17/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 08/02/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 08/02/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 09/06/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/06/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/21/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/21/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/05/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/05/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 11/05/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/05/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/14/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/14/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/29/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/06/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/16/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/24/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/29/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/30/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/15/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/15/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/19/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/19/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/21/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/25/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/12/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/18/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/18/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/17/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/17/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/30/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/30/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/30/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/30/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/30/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/30/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/30/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/30/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/21/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/13/2002